VA SB628 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; mixed beverage licensees; flavored distilled spirits. Requires the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board to adopt regulations prescribing the terms and conditions under which mixed beverage licensees may infuse, store, and sell flavored distilled spirits.
Title
Mixed beverage licensees; ABC Board to prescribe terms under which licensees may infuse spirits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 481 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB628ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Passed by temporarily | |
2010-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB628S2 | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Wagner agreed to 10104649D-S2 | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 10104649D-S2 (Wagner) | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 10104503D-S1 | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104503D-S1 | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10104218D |