VA SB625 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Low-to-Moderate Income Solar Loan and Rebate Fund and Pilot Program; financial incentives. Provides that the purpose of the Low-to-Moderate Income Solar Loan and Rebate Fund and the Low-to-Moderate Income Solar Loan and Rebate Pilot Program is to provide financial incentives, which may include grants, loans, rebates, and other inducements, to electric customers who complete solar installations and energy efficiency projects and renames the Fund and Program to the Low-to-Moderate Income Solar Financial Incentives Fund and Pilot Program to reflect such purpose. Under current law, the Fund and Program may only offer loans and rebates to customers who complete either solar installations or energy efficiency projects. The bill reassigns the duty to accept and review applications to the Program for such financial incentives from the Clean Energy Advisory Board to the DirecĀtor of the Department of Energy. The bill updates references to the Maryland-DC-Delaware-Virginia Solar Energy Industries Association with the association's new name, the Chesapeake Energy Storage and Solar Association. Low-to-Moderate Income Solar Loan and Rebate Fund and Pilot Program; financial incentives. Provides that the purpose of the Low-to-Moderate Income Solar Loan and Rebate Fund and the Low-to-Moderate Income Solar Loan and Rebate Pilot Program is to provide financial incentives, which may include grants, loans, rebates, and other inducements, to electric customers who complete solar installations and energy efficiency projects and renames the Fund and Program to the Low-to-Moderate Income Solar Financial Incentives Fund and Pilot Program to reflect such purpose. Under current law, the Fund and Program may only offer loans and rebates to customers who complete either solar installations or energy efficiency projects. The bill reassigns the duty to accept and review applications to the Program for such financial incentives from the Clean Energy Advisory Board to the DirecĀtor of the Department of Energy. The bill updates references to the Maryland-DC-Delaware-Virginia Solar Energy Industries Association with the association's new name, the Chesapeake Energy Storage and Solar Association.
Title
Low-to-Moderate Income Solar Financial Incentives Fund and Program; financial incentives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB625S1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105541D-S1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105541D-S1 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Energy |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22103673D |