VA SB624 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - House: Continued to 2011 in Privileges and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

State Board of Elections; voter lists. Rewrites the provisions stating who may obtain the lists of registered voters and lists of persons who voted in elections. Adds nonprofit organizations that promote voter participation and registration to the persons who may obtain the lists of persons voting at primaries and elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter lists; expands list of people and organizations who may purchase list of registered voters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-05 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-10 House: Continued to 2011 in Privileges and Elections
2010-03-10 House: Pursuant to House Rule 22
2010-03-10 House: Rereferred to Privileges and Elections
2010-03-10 House: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2010-03-09 House: Passed by for the day
2010-03-08 House: Read second time
2010-03-05 House: Committee substitute printed 10105685D-H1
2010-03-05 House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
2010-03-05 House: Reconsidered by Privileges and Elections
2010-02-26 House: Tabled in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
2010-02-25 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N)
2010-02-19 House: Assigned P & E sub: #5 Ad Hoc
2010-02-17 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2010-02-16 House: Assigned P & E sub: #3 Campaign Finance
2010-02-08 House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2010-02-08 House: Read first time
2010-02-08 House: Placed on Calendar
2010-02-01 Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2010-01-29 Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB624S1
2010-01-29 Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104660D-S1
2010-01-29 Senate: Reading of substitute waived
2010-01-29 Senate: Read second time
2010-01-28 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2010-01-26 Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104660D-S1
2010-01-26 Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2010-01-18 Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2010-01-18 Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10104321D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242405(n/a)See Bill Text
242406(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback