VA SB624 | 2008 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Left in Appropriations

Summary

Virginia Retirement System; superintendents and sworn officers of regional jails. Requires localities participating in the Virginia Retirement System and participating in a regional jail to provide retirement benefits comparable to the benefits provided to state police officers to the regional jail's superintendent and sworn officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement System; benefits for superintendents and sworn officers of regional jails.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2008-03-03 House: Left in Appropriations
2008-02-12 House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2008-02-12 House: Read first time
2008-02-12 House: Placed on Calendar
2008-02-01 Senate: Communicated to House
2008-02-01 Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2008-01-31 Senate: Read second time and engrossed
2008-01-30 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2008-01-29 Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2008-01-09 Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance
2008-01-09 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 085963348

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback