VA SB623 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authority of Governor to grant relief from fines and penalties. Eliminates provisions of the Code requiring a person seeking the Governor's relief from fines and penalties to first file a petition with the circuit court for such relief.
Title
Governor; authority to grant relief from fines and penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2022-03-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22103929D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 363 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 364 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 367 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 368 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |