VA SB622 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0734)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0734)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dental plans; reimbursement for health care services. Prohibits a contract between a dental plan and a dentist or oral surgeon from establishing the fee or rate that the dentist or oral surgeon is required to accept for the provision of health care services, or from requiring that a dentist or oral surgeon accept the reimbursement paid by the dental plan as payment in full, unless the services are covered services under the dental plan. The measure applies to contracts entered into, amended, extended, or renewed on or after July 1, 2010. The State Corporation Commission does not have jurisdiction to adjudicate individual controversies arising out of this measure.
Title
Dentists and oral surgeons; reimbursement for certain services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0734) | |
2010-04-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 734 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB622ER) | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-02-26 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Passed House (92-Y 4-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-23 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (18-Y 4-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB622S1 | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104727D-S1 | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104727D-S1 | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10103596D |