VA SB622 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0833)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0833)
Summary
Circuit Court clerks; electronic filing and recording; digital reproduction; recordation of judgments; secure remote access; deed cover sheets; fees collected by clerks. Clarifies a number of issues for circuit court clerks including (i) the use of the last four digits of a social security number on judgments (filer is responsible); (ii) that the clerk may provide information from a locality to remote access users; (iii) that the filer is responsible for cover sheet accuracy; (iv) allowing the clerk to rely on the cover sheet to index; and (v) the difference between e-filing of court records and e-recording of land records. The bill also provides standard definitions of subscriber, secure remote access, public access, and electronic recording of land records. The bill establishes a $5 per document fee for e-recording of a land record and provides for a subscription rate not to exceed $50 per month for remote access to land records. This bill is identical to
Title
Circuit court clerks; clarifies issues regarding electronic filing & recording of land records, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0833) | |
2008-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 833 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB622ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB622H1 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 089599328-H1 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 089599328-H1 | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 080864328-ES1 | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB622ES1 | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080864328-S1 | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080864328-S1 | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N) | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081736328 |
Same As/Similar To
HB1106 (Same As) 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB622 |