VA SB621 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Open-space and conservation easements; rule of construction. Provides that if language in an open-space or conservation easement acquired pursuant to state law is ambiguous, such language shall be construed against the grantor and in favor of the grantee.
Title
Open-space and conservation easements; rule of construction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Pending question, not ordered (15-Y 24-N) (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (7-Y 7-N 1-A) (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (7-Y 7-N 1-A) (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2020-03-12 | Senate | No further action taken |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Pending question, not ordered (15-Y 24-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20102937D-E |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB621E |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reconsidered by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (7-Y 7-N 1-A) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102937D |