VA SB620 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Nurse practitioners. Eliminates the requirement that a nurse practitioner practice as part of a patient care team with a practice agreement with a patient care physician. The bill also eliminates a Board of Health pilot program authorizing certain nurse practitioners to practice without a practice agreement as the bill makes such pilot obsolete. The bill requires regulations to be promulgated within 280 days of enactment.
Title
Nurse practitioners; eliminates requirement that they practice as part of patient care team.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2017 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-02 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Continued to 2017 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16103976D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 11.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 263 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 282 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2914 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2957 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2957.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2957.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2957.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3300.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3482 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3482.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |