VA SB62 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 210 (effective 7/1/20)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Marriage records; divorce and annulment reports; identification of race. Eliminates the requirement that the race of married parties be included in marriage records, divorce reports, and annulment reports filed with the State Registrar. The bill also removes the requirement that the State Registrar include race data in the compilation and posting of marriage, divorce, and annulment data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage records; divorce and annulment reports, eliminates requirement for identification of race.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 210 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020
2020-03-03SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 3, 2020
2020-02-26SenateSigned by President
2020-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-25SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB62ER)
2020-02-25SenateEnrolled
2020-02-21HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21HouseRead third time
2020-02-20HouseRead second time
2020-02-18HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-21SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB62S1
2020-01-20SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20105900D-S1
2020-01-20SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-20SenateRead second time
2020-01-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15SenateCommittee substitute printed 20105900D-S1
2020-01-15SenateIncorporates SB19 (Ebbin)
2020-01-15SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2019-11-19SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2019-11-19SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100816D

Same As/Similar To

SB19 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Incorporated by Judiciary
HB180 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 209 (effective 7/1/20)
SB1066 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 211 (effective 7/1/20)
HB1066 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321267(n/a)See Bill Text
321268(n/a)See Bill Text
321268.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback