VA SB619 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 472 (effective 7/1/20)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

School boards; mental health awareness training. Requires each school board to (i) adopt and implement policies that require each teacher and other relevant personnel, as determined by the school board, employed on a full-time basis, to complete a mental health awareness training or similar program at least once and (ii) provide such training, which may be provided pursuant to a contract with the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, a community services board, a behavioral health authority, a nonprofit organization, or other certified trainer or via an online module.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health awareness training; certain school board employees required to complete.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 472 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-07SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB619ER)
2020-03-05SenateEnrolled
2020-02-28SenateTitle replaced 20108280D-H1
2020-02-28SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (80-Y 19-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with substitute (80-Y 19-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House as amended SB619H1
2020-02-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108280D-H1
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2020-02-17HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-17HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108280D-H1
2020-02-17HouseReported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB619S1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107763D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107763D-S1
2020-02-06SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104685D

Same As/Similar To

HB74 (Same As) 2020-03-25 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 471 (effective 7/1/20)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221298.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB619&201+sum+SB619
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB619+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB619S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB619H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB619ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0184+SB0619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0235+SB0619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0619+SB0619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0619+SB0619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0619+SB0619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0619+SB0619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0619+SB0619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H09V0213+SB0619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0203V0031+SB0619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0403+SB0619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1495+SB0619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1237SB0619+SB0619

Bill Comments

feedback