VA SB619 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - House: Tabled in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - House: Tabled in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth Tolling Assistance Program. Establishes a program that would allow certain low-income students to receive an electronic tolling transponder without paying a deposit. To be eligible, the student must attend a public institution of higher education in Virginia located within a planning district that is traversed by the Elizabeth River or the James River and that is adjacent to the Chesapeake Bay. Eligible students who receive the electronic tolling transponder may also submit toll receipts, on a quarterly basis, and receive reimbursement in their E-ZPass accounts. The bill is contingent upon an appropriation of General Funds effectuating the provisions of the bill.
Title
Commonwealth Tolling Assistance Program; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 8-N) (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 8-N) (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | House: Tabled in Transportation by voice vote | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #4 | |
2012-02-15 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-15 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-15 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 8-N) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB619S1 | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Howell rejected | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105251D-S1 | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105251D-S1 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 4-N 1-A) | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12104165D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 1 | 223.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 223.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 223.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 23.03:4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |