VA SB616 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0958)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Game and Inland Fisheries; name change. Renames the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries as the Department of Wildlife Resources and the Board of Game and Inland Fisheries as the Board of Wildlife Resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Game and Inland Fisheries, Department of; name change.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 40-N) (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0958)
2020-04-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 958 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-17SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
2020-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by President
2020-03-12SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB616ER)
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Passage (60-Y 40-N)
2020-02-24HousePassed House (60-Y 40-N)
2020-02-24HouseRead third time
2020-02-21HouseRead second time
2020-02-19HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 6-N)
2020-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102183D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011018(n/a)See Bill Text
1011121(n/a)See Bill Text
1011152(n/a)See Bill Text
1011153(n/a)See Bill Text
1011156(n/a)See Bill Text
1011186(n/a)See Bill Text
1011417(n/a)See Bill Text
101204.1(n/a)See Bill Text
101211(n/a)See Bill Text
101405(n/a)See Bill Text
101651(n/a)See Bill Text
101659(n/a)See Bill Text
152915.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182134.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182308(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.016(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.02(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.03(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.06(n/a)See Bill Text
18256.1(n/a)See Bill Text
22106(n/a)See Bill Text
22215(n/a)See Bill Text
22220.2(n/a)See Bill Text
224002(n/a)See Bill Text
224024(n/a)See Bill Text
224030(n/a)See Bill Text
22507(n/a)See Bill Text
221204.2(n/a)See Bill Text
242411.2(n/a)See Bill Text
242416.3(n/a)See Bill Text
282106.1(n/a)See Bill Text
282108(n/a)See Bill Text
2821103(n/a)See Bill Text
2821205.1(n/a)See Bill Text
2821302(n/a)See Bill Text
2821403(n/a)See Bill Text
2821505(n/a)See Bill Text
282302.1(n/a)See Bill Text
282302.2(n/a)See Bill Text
282302.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text
282638(n/a)See Bill Text
291100(n/a)See Bill Text
291100.1(n/a)See Bill Text
291101.1(n/a)See Bill Text
291102(n/a)See Bill Text
291109(n/a)See Bill Text
291114(n/a)See Bill Text
291300.1(n/a)See Bill Text
291302.1(n/a)See Bill Text
291302.2(n/a)See Bill Text
291309.1(n/a)See Bill Text
291358(n/a)See Bill Text
291505.1(n/a)See Bill Text
291529(n/a)See Bill Text
291530.1(n/a)See Bill Text
291530.4(n/a)See Bill Text
291532(n/a)See Bill Text
291753.3(n/a)See Bill Text
291801(n/a)See Bill Text
32108.1(n/a)See Bill Text
323904(n/a)See Bill Text
323936(n/a)See Bill Text
323937(n/a)See Bill Text
326525(n/a)See Bill Text
32801(n/a)See Bill Text
32148.1(n/a)See Bill Text
332329(n/a)See Bill Text
332613(n/a)See Bill Text
332909(n/a)See Bill Text
332910(n/a)See Bill Text
511212(n/a)See Bill Text
5413800(n/a)See Bill Text
5512902(n/a)See Bill Text
5811405(n/a)See Bill Text
5811410(n/a)See Bill Text
5812289(n/a)See Bill Text
581344.3(n/a)See Bill Text
5813510.4(n/a)See Bill Text
5813942(n/a)See Bill Text
591148.3(n/a)See Bill Text
621250(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:20(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:5.01(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:6(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:81(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.19:6(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.33(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.34:25(n/a)See Bill Text
652402(n/a)See Bill Text
652402.1(n/a)See Bill Text
801480(n/a)See Bill Text
91101(n/a)See Bill Text
91500(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback