VA SB614 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modification of spousal support. Provides that no request for modification of spousal support based on a material change in circumstances or the terms of stipulation or contract shall be denied solely on the basis of the terms of any stipulation or contract that is executed on or after July 1, 2018, unless such stipulation or contract contains specific language set out in the bill.
Title
Spousal support; modification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 701 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB614ER) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18102511D-E |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB614E |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102511D |