VA SB611 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0604)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Truck Manufacturing Grant Fund; creation. Creates the Truck Manufacturing Grant Fund to make grant payments to an eligible truck manufacturer that makes a capital investment of at least $397 million at a facility in Pulaski County and creates at least 777 new full-time jobs at the facility. The eligible truck manufacturer would be eligible for an aggregate of $16.5 million in grants paid out over a 10-year period if it meets such performance parameters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Truck Manufacturing Grant Fund; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 8-N) (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0604)
2020-04-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 604 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-07SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB611ER)
2020-03-05SenateEnrolled
2020-02-28SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (89-Y 8-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with amendment (89-Y 8-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-02-26HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-18HouseReferred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102801D

Same As/Similar To

HB1361 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0265)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591284.33(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB611&201+sum+SB611
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB611+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB611ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0604+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0024+SB0611
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0119SB0611+SB0611
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0140SB0611+SB0611
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0201V0045+SB0611
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0398+SB0611
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1475+SB0611
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1236SB0611+SB0611

Bill Comments

feedback