VA SB610 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Pharmaceutical Manufacturing Grant Program; creation. Creates the Pharmaceutical Manufacturing Grant Program to make grant payments to an eligible pharmaceutical manufacturer that makes a capital investment of at least $1 billion at a facility in Rockingham County and creates at least 152 new full-time jobs at the facility. The pharmaceutical manufacturer would be eligible for an aggregate of $7.5 million in grants paid out over a three-year period if it meets such performance parameters. The bill also makes available, subject to appropriation, $2.525 million to a comprehensive community college and baccalaureate public institution of higher education in or near Rockingham County to support the workforce development needs of the manufacturer and other research and development companies in the area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmaceutical Manufacturing Grant Program and Fund; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 8-N) (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758)
2020-04-06 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 758 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-04SenateSigned by President
2020-03-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-03SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB610ER)
2020-03-03SenateEnrolled
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (87-Y 8-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House (87-Y 8-N)
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-18HouseReferred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
2020-01-23SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-16SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102793D

Same As/Similar To

HB1498 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0275)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591284.33(n/a)See Bill Text
591284.34(n/a)See Bill Text
591284.35(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB610&201+sum+SB610
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB610+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB610ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0758+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0030+SB0610
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0023+SB0610
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0119SB0610+SB0610
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0146SB0610+SB0610
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0201V0044+SB0610
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0397+SB0610
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1476+SB0610

Bill Comments

feedback