VA SB610 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0760)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0760)
Summary
Compensation of court-appointed counsel; juvenile offenders. Provides that court-appointed counsel who are appointed to defend a juvenile in district court for an offense that would be a felony if committed by an adult may request a waiver on the compensation cap up to certain specified amounts depending on the charges being defended when the effort expended, the time reasonably necessary for the particular representation, the novelty and difficulty of the issues, or other circumstances warrant such a waiver. The maximum amounts of the waivers allowed are fixed at the level of the compensation cap for defending adults of the same crimes in circuit court.
Title
Court-appointed counsel; compensation in district court for those defending juvenile offenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0760) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 760 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB610ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2008-03-03 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-03-03 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-27 | House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (23-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Assigned App. sub: General Government (Abbitt) | |
2008-02-15 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-15 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 089838328 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB610 |