VA SB608 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0206)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0206)
Summary
Crimes; effect of subsequent marriage to child over 14 years of age. Repeals the code section that provides a defense to carnal knowledge of a child 14 years of age or older when there is a subsequent marriage of the victim and the perpetrator.
Title
Crimes; effect of subsequent marriage to child over 14 years of age.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0206) | |
2008-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 206 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB608ER) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-20 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-19 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-15 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB608S1 | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080841328-S1 | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080841328-S1 | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 089837328 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB608 |