VA SB606 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB606
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; increased retirement allowance for certain judges. Increases, for the purposes of determining benefits provided under the Judicial Retirement System, the retirement multiplier from one percent to 1.70 percent. The increase would apply only to judges appointed on or after July 1, 2020, who are participants in the hybrid retirement program and who are at least age 55 at the time of appointment.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; increased retirement allowance for certain judges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Senate | Left in Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102250D |
Same As/Similar To
SB606 (Carry Over) 2020-01-28 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N)