VA SB602 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Economic Development Incentive Grant Program. Extends the award of Virginia Economic Development Incentive Grants for eligible projects on and after July 1, 2016, in the aggregate amount of not more than $6 million in any fiscal year and an aggregate total amount of grants outstanding of not more than $30 million.
Title
Virginia Economic Development Incentive Grant Program; extends award of grants for eligible project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2016-02-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources and Technology |
2016-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16100808D |