VA SB602 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of West Point. Shifts town elections from May to November and provides that vacancies on the town council shall be filled in accordance with state law. The bill also grants the mayor veto power over any action of the council; the current law gives the mayor veto power over ordinances and resolutions. The bill also removes the requirements that the council meet once a month and keep a journal of its official proceedings. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Charter; Town of West Point.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487) | |
2012-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 487 (effective 3/30/12) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB602ER) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-24 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12103254D-E | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB602E | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Emergency clause added | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (11-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12103254D |