VA SB591 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Post-election audits. Defines "post-election audit" to mean a process conducted after an election to confirm the accurate reporting of the results of the election and directs the State Board of Elections to establish a work group tasked with developing standards and procedures for conducting post-election audits in the Commonwealth. The work group is required, at a minimum, to (i) consider the types of post-election audits available and being implemented in other states, (ii) recommend the type of post-election audit to be used in the Commonwealth, (iii) establish the process and procedures for conducting the recommended post-election audit, including the timeline, (iv) recommend actions to be taken if the post-election audit results indicate that the voting systems did not accurately count the ballots cast in the election, and (v) propose legislation for implementing the work group's recommendations. The work group is directed to submit an interim progress report by January 7, 2019, and a final report by December 1, 2019, to the Governor and the General Assembly. The bill repeals the current law regarding post-election risk-limiting audits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Post-election audits; definition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2018-03-02HouseContinued to 2019 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
2018-02-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N)
2018-02-15HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-02-15HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-02-15HouseRead first time
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-12SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2018-02-12SenatePassed by temporarily
2018-02-09SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB591S1
2018-02-09SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18106830D-S1
2018-02-09SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-09SenateRead second time
2018-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106830D-S1
2018-02-06SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 2-N)
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102749D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242669(n/a)See Bill Text
242671.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242671.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback