VA SB591 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
Summary
Local tourism zones. Increases from 10 to 20 the number of years in which tax incentives may be provided in a local tourism zone.
Title
Tourism zones, local; increases number of years which tax incentives may be provided therein.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462) | |
2008-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 462 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-02 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-28 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB591ER) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-27 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-26 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-25 | House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | House: Assigned Finance sub: 1 | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088773284 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB591 |