VA SB590 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
When circuit courts open; Judicial Council. Allows the Judicial Council to determine when the circuit courts are open subject to the current allowances in the Code for holidays and safety concerns. The bill also clarifies that these provisions do not empower the Judicial Council to set the hours of operation of a circuit court clerk's office.
Title
When circuit courts open; Judicial Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548) | |
2016-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 548 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB590ER) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-01 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-02-26 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103023D |
Same As/Similar To
HB442 (Same As) 2016-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237)