VA SB590 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0877)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0877)
Summary
Sex offenders; registration; penalty. Makes various amendments addressing the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry including which crimes require what level of registration and the length of registration (15 years prior to petition, 25 years prior to petition, or life) in order to ensure that Virginia law complies with the federal Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Act of 2006 (42 U.S.C. ยง 16901 et seq.). The bill also requires persons convicted of carnal knowledge of a child 13 or 14 years of age to register as a violent sex offender if the person convicted was more than five years older than the victim.
Title
Sex Offender & Crimes Against Minors Registry; person may petition circuit court about registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0877) | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 877 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-04-23 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB590ER2) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-22 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-11 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2008-03-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-24 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB590ER) | |
2008-03-24 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-03-08 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (85-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-08 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (85-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Conference substitute printed 080918248-S3 | |
2008-03-06 | House: Delegates: Bell, Griffith, Marsden | |
2008-03-06 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senators: Howell, Edwards, Cuccinelli | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (36-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2008-03-06 | House: House insisted on substitute with amendments | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: House substitute with amendments rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute with amendments (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments SB590H1 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Amendments by Delegate Bell agreed to | |
2008-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 080887248-H1 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 080887248-H1 | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB590S2 | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute Finance agreed to 080872248-S2 | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute Courts of Justice rejected 080264248-S1 | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080872248-S2 | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080264248-S1 | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080244806 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB590 |