VA SB585 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0252)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Capital outlay plan. Updates the six-year capital outlay plan for projects to be funded entirely or partially from general fund-supported resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capital outlay plan; repeals existing six-year capital outlay for projects to be funded.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-28 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0252)
2024-03-28 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 252 (effective 7/1/24)
2024-03-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024
2024-03-27SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024
2024-03-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2024-03-25SenateSigned by President
2024-03-25SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB585ER)
2024-03-25SenateEnrolled
2024-03-09SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2024-03-06HouseVOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N)
2024-03-06HouseConference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2024-03-06 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2024-03-01HouseDelegates: Torian, Sickles, Coyner
2024-03-01HouseConferees appointed by House
2024-02-29SenateSenators: Deeds, Locke, McPike
2024-02-29SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2024-02-29SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2024-02-27HouseHouse requested conference committee
2024-02-27HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2024-02-26SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2024-02-22HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2024-02-22HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2024-02-22HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB585H1
2024-02-22HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 24107883D-H1
2024-02-22HouseRead third time
2024-02-21HouseRead second time
2024-02-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 24107883D-H1
2024-02-19HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2024-02-15HouseAssigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay
2024-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2024-02-14HouseRead first time
2024-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2024-02-08SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2024-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2024-02-08SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB585S1
2024-02-08SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 24106295D-S1
2024-02-08SenateReading of substitute waived
2024-02-08SenateRead second time
2024-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2024-02-06SenateIncorporates SB601 (Lucas)
2024-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 24106295D-S1
2024-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2024-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2024-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104339D

Same As/Similar To

HB715 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221516(n/a)See Bill Text
221517(n/a)See Bill Text
221518(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+SB585
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+SB585+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+SB585S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+SB585H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+SB585ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+CHAP0252+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+amd+SB585AC
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+SB585F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+SB585FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+SB585FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+SB585FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+S05V0146+SB0585
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0274SB0585+SB0585
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0283SB0585+SB0585
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0284SB0585+SB0585
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H02V0265+SB0585
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+HV1079+SB0585
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0615SB0585+SB0585
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0806SB0585+SB0585
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+HV1608+SB0585
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV1214SB0585+SB0585

Bill Comments

feedback