VA SB583 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Western Virginia Transportation Fund; revenues. Creates the Western Virginia Transportation Fund (Fund), to be used by the West Virginian Transportation Commission, also created by the bill, to fund transportation projects in Planning Districts 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7. The bill imposes an additional 2.1 percent regional tax on motor vehicle fuels in the counties and cities in such planning districts to generate revenue for the Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Western Virginia Transportation Fund; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30HouseLeft in Finance
2018-02-26HouseContinued to 2019 in Finance by voice vote
2018-02-20HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-13SenatePassed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB583S2
2018-02-13SenateSubstitute by Senator Hanger agreed to 18107059D-S2
2018-02-13SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-13SenateFloor substitute printed 18107059D-S2 (Hanger)
2018-02-13SenateCommittee substitute rejected 18106873D-S1
2018-02-13SenateRead second time
2018-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106873D-S1
2018-02-08SenateReported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104752D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3323400(n/a)See Bill Text
5812295(n/a)See Bill Text
5812299.20(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback