VA SB580 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Data collection and dissemination; governance. Amends the Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act (?§2.2-3800 et seq.) to facilitate the sharing of data among agencies of the Commonwealth and between the Commonwealth and political subdivisions. The bill creates the position of Chief Data Officer of the Commonwealth (CDO), housed in the office of the Secretary of Administration, to (i) develop guidelines regarding data usage, storage, and privacy and (ii) coordinate and oversee data sharing in the Commonwealth to promote the usage of data in improving the delivery of services. The bill also creates a temporary Data Sharing and Analytics Advisory Committee (Advisory Committee) to advise the CDO in the initial establishment of guidelines and best practices and to make recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly regarding a permanent data governance structure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act; amends Act to facilitate sharing data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 679 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-12SenateSigned by President
2018-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-10SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB580ER)
2018-03-10SenateEnrolled
2018-03-08SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2018-03-07HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HousePassed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2018-03-07HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-03-07HouseRead third time
2018-03-06HouseRead second time
2018-03-02HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2018-03-02HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-03-01HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-03-01HouseReported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-13SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB580S2
2018-02-13SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18106874D-S2
2018-02-13SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-13SenateCommittee substitute rejected 18106521D-S1
2018-02-13SenateRead second time
2018-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106874D-S2
2018-02-08SenateIncorporates SB804 (Carrico)
2018-02-08SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-05SenateIncorporates SB830 (Barker)
2018-02-05SenateIncorporates SB719 (Dunnavant)
2018-02-05SenateIncorporates SB459 (Edwards)
2018-02-05SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106521D-S1
2018-02-05SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25SenateAssigned GL&T sub: #2
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2018-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103234D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22225.2(n/a)See Bill Text
223800(n/a)See Bill Text
223801(n/a)See Bill Text
223803(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB580
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB580+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB580S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB580S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB580ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0679+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S12V0097+SB0580
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0215+SB0580
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0410SB0580+SB0580
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0480SB0580+SB0580
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0481SB0580+SB0580
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1104V0072+SB0580
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0282+SB0580
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0201V0030+SB0580
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H02V0203+SB0580
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1421+SB0580
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1081SB0580+SB0580

Bill Comments

feedback