VA SB58 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-15 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Minimum wage. Increases the minimum wage from its current federally mandated level of $7.25 per hour to $8.00 per hour effective July 1, 2018, to $9.00 per hour effective July 1, 2019, and to $10.10 per hour effective July 1, 2020, unless a higher minimum wage is required by the federal Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA). The measure also provides that the Virginia minimum wage applies to persons whose employment is covered by the FLSA and to persons employed by the Commonwealth, its agencies or political subdivisions, or a public body.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum wage; increases wage from its current federally mandated level.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-15SenatePassed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 3-N)
2018-01-15SenateIncorporates SB251 (Dance)
2018-01-15SenateIncorporates SB240 (Marsden)
2018-01-15SenateCommittee substitute printed to LIS only 18105242D-S1
2017-11-29SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-11-29SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101590D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4012.1(n/a)See Bill Text
40128.10(n/a)See Bill Text
40128.9(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback