VA SB576 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Research and development in the Commonwealth. Creates the Commonwealth of Virginia Innovation Partnership Authority (the Authority) to oversee and support research, development, and commercialization, as well as related investment and seed-stage funding, in the Commonwealth. The Authority will be governed by an 11-member Board, consisting of the Secretary of Commerce and Trade, six nonlegislative members appointed by the Governor, and four nonlegislative citizen members appointed by the Joint Rules Committee. Existing grant, loan, and investment funds currently administered by the Innovation and Entrepreneurship Investment Authority and the Virginia Research Investment Committee, repealed under the bill, would be consolidated under the Authority, and the Authority would be responsible for developing an Innovation Index for the Commonwealth. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commonwealth of Virginia Innovation Partnership Authority; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (88-Y 7-N) (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB576ER)
2020-03-08HouseVOTE: Adoption (88-Y 7-N)
2020-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (88-Y 7-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference substitute printed 20109833D-S2
2020-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05HouseDelegates: Sickles, Ayala, Austin
2020-03-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-03SenateSenators: Howell, Barker, Vogel
2020-03-03SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-03SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-03-02HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-02-28SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (95-Y 4-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with substitute (95-Y 4-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB576H1
2020-02-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108586D-H1
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108586D-H1
2020-02-21HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-06SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB576S1
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107606D-S1
2020-02-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-06SenateRead second time
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107606D-S1
2020-02-04SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103653D

Same As/Similar To

HB1017 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22204(n/a)See Bill Text
222218(n/a)See Bill Text
222233.1(n/a)See Bill Text
22225(n/a)See Bill Text
222351(n/a)See Bill Text
222364(n/a)See Bill Text
223705.6(n/a)See Bill Text
223705.7(n/a)See Bill Text
223711(n/a)See Bill Text
231203(n/a)See Bill Text
2313130(n/a)See Bill Text
2313134(n/a)See Bill Text
511124.38(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB576&201+sum+SB576
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB576+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB576S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB576H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB576S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB576ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0154+SB0576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0357SB0576+SB0576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0373SB0576+SB0576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0374SB0576+SB0576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0201V0048+SB0576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0396+SB0576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1477+SB0576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1235SB0576+SB0576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1430SB0576+SB0576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1792SB0576+SB0576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2106+SB0576

Bill Comments

feedback