VA SB575 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prescription Monitoring Program; information disclosed to the Emergency Department Care Coordination Program; redisclosure. Provides for the mutual exchange of information between the Prescription Monitoring Program and the Emergency Department Care Coordination Program and clarifies that nothing shall prohibit the redisclosure of confidential information from the Prescription Monitoring Program or any data or reports produced by the Prescription Monitoring Program disclosed to the Emergency Department Care Coordination Program to a prescriber in an electronic report generated by the Emergency Department Care Coordination Program so long as the electronic report complies with relevant federal law and regulations governing privacy of health information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Monitoring Program; information disclosed to Emergency Department Information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 94 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB575ER)
2020-03-08SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-03-08HouseVOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N)
2020-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
2020-03-08SenateSenators: Dunnavant, Petersen, Barker
2020-03-08SenateSecond conferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-07HouseDelegates: Hurst. Adams,D.M., Hodges
2020-03-07HouseSecond conferees appointed by House
2020-03-07HouseHouse acceded to request for second conference committee
2020-03-07SenateSenate requested second conference committee (37-Y 2-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference report rejected by House (0-Y 95-N)
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-03HouseDelegates: Hurst, Adams, D.M., Hodges
2020-03-03HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-02SenateSenators: Dunnavant, Petersen, Barker
2020-03-02SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-02SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-02-27HouseHouse insisted on amendments
2020-02-26SenateHouse amendments rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
2020-02-25SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-21HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21HousePassed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-02-21HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-21HouseRead third time
2020-02-20HouseRead second time
2020-02-18HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-10SenatePrinted as engrossed 20104969D-E
2020-02-10SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB575E
2020-02-10SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-10SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-10SenateRead second time
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104969D

Same As/Similar To

HB648 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412523(n/a)See Bill Text
5412525(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB575&201+sum+SB575
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB575+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB575E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB575ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0157+SB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0410SB0575+SB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0450SB0575+SB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0451SB0575+SB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0348+SB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1202+SB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0998SB0575+SB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1364SB0575+SB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1957+SB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1773SB0575+SB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1807SB0575+SB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2107+SB0575
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1884SB0575+SB0575

Bill Comments

feedback