VA SB574 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Step therapy protocols. Requires health benefit plans that restrict the use of any prescription drug through the use of a step therapy protocol to have in place a clear, convenient, and expeditious process for a prescribing medical provider to request an override of such restrictions for a patient. A step therapy protocol is a protocol or program that (i) establishes the specific sequence in which prescription drugs for a specified medical condition are medically appropriate for a particular covered person and are covered by a health benefit plan or that (ii) conditions coverage of a prescription medication on a patient's first trying an alternative medication without success. The measure requires the granting of a step therapy protocol override if any of certain conditions are satisfied.
Title
Step therapy protocols; health benefits, disclosure of information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (8-Y 6-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102150D |