VA SB572 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0854)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0854)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alzheimer's disease and related dementias; early detection and diagnosis; risk reduction and care planning. Provides that the Department of Health, in consultation with the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services, shall have the lead responsibility for taking actions to address and reduce the risks and impairments associated with Alzheimer's disease and related dementias within the Commonwealth.
Title
Alzheimer's disease and related dementias; early detection and diagnosis, risk reduction and care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0854) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 854 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB572ER) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-21 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101864D |