VA SB570 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State-Funded Kinship Guardianship Assistance program. Creates the State-Funded Kinship Guardianship Assistance program (the program) to facilitate child placements with relatives, including fictive kin, and ensure permanency for children in foster care. The bill sets forth eligibility criteria for the program, payment allowances to kinship guardians, and requirements for kinship guardianship assistance agreements. The bill also expands eligibility for the Federal-Funded Kinship Guardianship Assistance program by allowing payments to be made to fictive kin who receive custody of a child of whom they have been the foster parent. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
State-Funded Kinship Guardianship Assistance program; created, effective clause.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2020-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20105861D-ES1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB570ES1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20105861D-S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20105861D-S1 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100620D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 900.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |