VA SB57 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act; definition of gift; certain tickets and registration or admission fees. Exempts from the definition of gift tickets and registration or admission fees to an event that are provided by an agency to its own officers or employees for the purposes of performing official duties related to the officer's or employee's public service.
Title
Conflict of Interests Act, State and Local Government; definition of gift, certain tickets, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 529 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB57ER) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-12-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101369D |
Same As/Similar To
HB216 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0528)
HB216 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0528)
HB216 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0528)