VA SB569 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB569

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; Department of State Police; mobile applications; mental health and public safety. Requires the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services (DBHDS) to develop or obtain a mental health mobile application to facilitate the provision of crisis intervention services by licensed clinicians to individuals in the Commonwealth through calls, texts, and online chat portals. The bill requires the mobile application to be integrated with the crisis intervention phone hotline established as part of System Transformation Excellence and Performance (STEP-VA). The Secretary of Health and Human Resources is directed to promote, market, and advertise the use of such application using existing resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DBHDS and VSP; mobile applications, mental health and public safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HouseContinued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-02-13HouseAssigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-31SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB569S1
2020-01-30SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106691D-S1
2020-01-30SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-30SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2020-01-30SenateRead second time
2020-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106691D-S1
2020-01-28SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-16SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101473D

Same As/Similar To

SB569 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
372312.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB569
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB569+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB569S1+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB569AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB569ASR
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB569F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB569FS1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04C0032+SB0569
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05C0060+SB0569
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0232SB0569+SB0569
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0249SB0569+SB0569

Bill Comments

feedback