VA SB569 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB569
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; Department of State Police; mobile applications; mental health and public safety. Requires the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services (DBHDS) to develop or obtain a mental health mobile application to facilitate the provision of crisis intervention services by licensed clinicians to individuals in the Commonwealth through calls, texts, and online chat portals. The bill requires the mobile application to be integrated with the crisis intervention phone hotline established as part of System Transformation Excellence and Performance (STEP-VA). The Secretary of Health and Human Resources is directed to promote, market, and advertise the use of such application using existing resources.
Title
DBHDS and VSP; mobile applications, mental health and public safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB569S1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106691D-S1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106691D-S1 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101473D |
Same As/Similar To
SB569 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote