VA SB569 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0767)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0767)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; Board for Contractors; exemption from licensure. Exempts from licensure any person who is performing work directly under the supervision of a licensed contractor and is (i) a student in good standing and enrolled in a public or private institution of higher education, (ii) a student enrolled in a career training or technical education program, or (iii) an apprentice. The bill expands a current exemption from licensure for work undertaken by a person providing construction, remodeling, repair, improvement, removal, or demolition on behalf of a properly licensed contractor by raising the value threshold from $2,500 or less to $5,000 or less per project and by adding a home improvement building contractor classification to the list of valid licenses the supervising contractor may hold.
Title
Contractors, Board for; exemption from licensure certain students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0767) | |
2018-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 767 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB569ER) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed House (72-Y 26-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB569S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Substitute by Senator DeSteph agreed to 18106618D-S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 18106618D-S1 (DeSteph) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104652D |