VA SB567 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Disability insurance; childbirth. Requires each insurer proposing to issue individual or group accident and sickness insurance policies providing short-term disability income protection coverage whose policies provide coverage for short-term disability arising out of childbirth to provide coverage for a payable benefit of at least 12 weeks following childbirth for such a disability. The bill also requires the State Corporation Commission to solicit comments from insurance industry stakeholders on the impact of the bill on current and future short-term disability policyholders and to report to the Chairs of the House Committee on Labor and Commerce and the Senate Committee on Commerce and Labor prior to December 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disability insurance; coverage for disability arising out of childbirth, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB567ER)
2020-03-06SenateEnrolled
2020-03-02SenateTitle replaced 20108491D-H1
2020-03-02SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB567H1
2020-02-28HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108491D-H1
2020-02-28HouseRead third time
2020-02-27HouseRead second time
2020-02-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108491D-H1
2020-02-25HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-09SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101951D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823407.11:4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB567&201+sum+SB567
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB567+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB567H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB567ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0103+SB0567
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0459SB0567+SB0567
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0567+SB0567
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0567+SB0567
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0567+SB0567
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0567+SB0567
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0315+SB0567
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1636+SB0567
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1342SB0567+SB0567

Bill Comments

feedback