VA SB566 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Involuntary psychiatric admission from local correctional facility. Clarifies that for the purposes of petitioning for the involuntary psychiatric treatment of an inmate in a local correctional facility, the petition shall be filed by the sheriff or other person in charge of the local correctional facility where the inmate is incarcerated.
Title
Involuntary psychiatric treatment of an inmate; petition filed by sheriff.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 357 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016 | |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB566ER) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2016-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health |
2016-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16103564D-E |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB566E |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103564D |
Same As/Similar To
HB543 (Same As) 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0599)