VA SB564 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sealing of offenses resulting in a deferred and dismissed disposition or conviction. Eliminates the lifetime cap on the number of sealing petitions that may be filed. The bill reduces from seven years to three years for a misdemeanor offense and from 10 years to seven years for a felony offense the minimum period of time between the offense to be sealed and the filing of the sealing petition during which the petitioner must not have been convicted of violating any law of the Commonwealth. The bill also reduces from seven years to three years the minimum period of time between the offense to be sealed and the automatic sealing of a misdemeanor offense. The bill also clarifies that a sealing petition may seal records related to any violation of the terms and conditions of a suspended sentence or probation for such conviction that were specifically set forth in the petition to be sealed. Sealing of offenses resulting in a deferred and dismissed disposition or conviction. Eliminates the lifetime cap on the number of sealing petitions that may be filed. The bill reduces from seven years to three years for a misdemeanor offense and from 10 years to seven years for a felony offense the minimum period of time between the offense to be sealed and the filing of the sealing petition during which the petitioner must not have been convicted of violating any law of the Commonwealth. The bill also reduces from seven years to three years the minimum period of time between the offense to be sealed and the automatic sealing of a misdemeanor offense. The bill also clarifies that a sealing petition may seal records related to any violation of the terms and conditions of a suspended sentence or probation for such conviction that were specifically set forth in the petition to be sealed.
Title
Criminal records; sealing of offenses resulting in a deferred & dismissed disposition or conviction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (7-Y 6-N 2-A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (7-Y 6-N 2-A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2022-03-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22105787D-ES1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB564ES1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105787D-S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105787D-S1 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (7-Y 6-N 2-A) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104109D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 392.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |