VA SB564 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public access to nonconfidential court records. Provides that a clerk of court or the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court shall make nonconfidential court records or reports of aggregated, nonconfidential case data available to the public upon request. The bill specifies that such records or reports shall be provided no later than 30 days after the request. The bill further provides that the clerk may charge a fee for responding to such request that shall not exceed the actual cost incurred in accessing, duplicating, reviewing, supplying, or searching for the requested records. Finally, the bill requires the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court to make available to the public an online case information system of nonconfidential information for criminal cases by July 1, 2019. This bill incorporates SB 519 and is identical to HB 780.
Title
Nonconfidential court records; clerk of court shall make records available to public upon request.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 584 (effective - see bill) | |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB564ER) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title replaced 18107387D-H1 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House with substitute (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House with substitute (97-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB564H1 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18107387D-H1 |
2018-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Taken up out of order pursuant to House Rule 52 (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107387D-H1 |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18106007D-ES1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB564ES1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106007D-S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Incorporates SB519 (Mason) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106007D-S1 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104550D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 69.54:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 292 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 293 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 293.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |