VA SB557 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Transportation; electronic speed indicator signs; U.S. Route 17. Requires the Commissioner of Highways to place at least six permanent electronic speed indicator signs on U.S. Route 17 near particular intersections in Fauquier County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VDOT; electronic speed indicator signs on U.S. Route 17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 21-N) (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-07SenateSigned by President
2020-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB557ER)
2020-03-07SenateEnrolled
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Passage (74-Y 21-N)
2020-03-04HousePassed House (74-Y 21-N)
2020-03-04HouseRead third time
2020-03-03HouseRead second time
2020-02-28HouseReported from Appropriations (20-Y 2-N)
2020-02-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
2020-02-20HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-20HouseReported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N)
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20104606D-E
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB557E
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-23SenateReported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104606D

Same As/Similar To

HB941 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB557&201+sum+SB557
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB557+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB557E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB557ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S11V0014+SB0557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0224+SB0557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0557+SB0557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0557+SB0557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0557+SB0557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0557+SB0557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0557+SB0557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1901V0047+SB0557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H19V0153+SB0557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0207V0039+SB0557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0422+SB0557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0462+SB0557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0502+SB0557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1836+SB0557

Bill Comments

feedback