VA SB556 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-29 - House: Tabled in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-29 - House: Tabled in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Summary
Reckless driving; violation of right-of-way resulting in death of another. Provides that a person is guilty of reckless driving if he violates the right-of-way of any motor vehicle causing the death of another.
Title
Reckless driving; violation of right-of-way resulting in death of another.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-29 | House: Tabled in Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2008-02-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 10-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB556S1 | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 081545288-S1 | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 081545288-S1 | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084723288 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB556 |