VA SB554 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0265)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0265)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Will contest; presumption of undue influence. Provides that in any case contesting the validity of a decedent's will where a presumption of undue influence arises, the finder of fact shall presume that undue influence was exerted over the decedent unless, based on all the evidence introduced at trial, the finder of fact finds that the decedent did intend it to be his will. Will contest; presumption of undue influence. Provides that in any case contesting the validity of a decedent's will where a presumption of undue influence arises, the finder of fact shall presume that undue influence was exerted over the decedent unless, based on all the evidence introduced at trial, the finder of fact finds that the decedent did intend it to be his will.
Title
Will contest; presumption of undue influence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 41-N) (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0265) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 265 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB554ER) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (59-Y 41-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House (59-Y 41-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB554S1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106571D-S1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106571D-S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101897D |