VA SB549 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0322)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Conditional zoning. Provides that no locality shall (i) request or accept any unreasonable proffer in connection with a rezoning or a proffer condition amendment as a condition of approval of a new residential development or new residential use or (ii) deny any rezoning application, including an application for amendment to an existing proffer, for a new residential development or new residential use where such denial is based on an applicant’s failure or refusal to submit, or remain subject to, an unreasonable proffer. A proffer shall be deemed unreasonable unless it addresses an impact that is specifically attributable to a proposed new residential development or other new residential use applied for. An offsite proffer shall be deemed unreasonable pursuant to the above unless it addresses an impact to an off-site public facility such that (a) the new residential development or new residential use creates a need, or an identifiable portion of a need, for one or more public facility improvements in excess of existing public facility capacity at the time of the rezoning or proffer condition amendment and (b) each such new residential development or new residential use applied for receives a direct and material benefit from a proffer made with respect to any such public facility improvements. In any action in which a locality has denied a rezoning or an amendment to an existing proffer and the aggrieved applicant proves by a preponderance of the evidence that it refused or failed to submit, or remain subject to, an unreasonable proffer that it has proven was suggested, requested, or required, formally or informally, by the locality, the court shall presume, absent clear and convincing evidence to the contrary, that such refusal or failure was the controlling basis for the denial.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conditional zoning; provisions applicable to certain rezoning proffers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 5-N 2-A) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N 2-A) (Y: 74 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 8-N 2-A) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (10-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0322)
2016-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 322 (effective 7/1/16)
2016-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 8, 2016
2016-03-01SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/1/16
2016-02-29SenateSigned by President
2016-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-02-26SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB549ER)
2016-02-26SenateEnrolled
2016-02-25SenateTitle replaced 16105559D-H1
2016-02-25SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 5-N 2-A)
2016-02-23HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N 2-A)
2016-02-23HousePassed House with substitute (72-Y 26-N 2-A)
2016-02-23HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB549H1
2016-02-23HousePending question ordered
2016-02-23HouseAmendments by Delegate Marshall, R.G. rejected
2016-02-23HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 16105559D-H1
2016-02-23HouseSubstitute by Delegate Cole rejected 16105756D-H2
2016-02-23HouseRead third time
2016-02-23HouseFloor substitute printed 16105756D-H2 (Cole)
2016-02-22HouseRead second time
2016-02-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 16105559D-H1
2016-02-19HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (17-Y 4-N)
2016-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
2016-02-16HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
2016-02-11HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2016-02-11HouseRead first time
2016-02-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-02-09SenateRead third time and passed Senate (29-Y 8-N 2-A)
2016-02-08SenatePassed by for the day
2016-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB549S2
2016-02-05SenateSubstitute by Senator Obenshain agreed to 16105216D-S2
2016-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2016-02-05SenateCommittee substitute rejected 16105117D-S1
2016-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2016-02-05SenateRead second time
2016-02-05SenateFloor substitute printed 16105216D-S2 (Obenshain)
2016-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2016-02-02SenateReported from Local Government with substitute (10-Y 2-N 1-A)
2016-02-02SenateCommittee substitute printed 16105117D-S1
2016-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2016-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103808D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522303.4(n/a)See Bill Text
1522303.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+SB549
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB549+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB549S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB549S2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB549H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB549H2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB549ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+CHAP0322+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S07V0029+SB0549
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0201SB0549+SB0549
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0259SB0549+SB0549
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H0702V0030+SB0549
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H07V0071+SB0549
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV0843+SB0549
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0610SB0549+SB0549

Bill Comments 750

feedback