VA SB542 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0528)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0528)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Delinquent sewer charges; lien; unlimited time. Allows a locality that provides water or sewer service to a property owner, rather than to a tenant, to place a lien on the property receiving the service in the amount of the number of months of delinquent charges. Current law allows the placement of liens in the amount of up to three months of delinquent water and sewer charges.
Title
Delinquent sewer charges; lien on property, delinquent charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 4-N) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0528) | |
2016-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 528 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB542ER) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-01 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 4-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed House (90-Y 4-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-29 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-26 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16102424D-E |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB542E |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendments (9-Y 4-N) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102424D |