VA SB537 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0620)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0620)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Powers of local government; trees during development process; replacement and conservation. Prevents the prohibition or the unreasonable limitation of silvicultural activities related to the replacement of trees during the development process and the conservation of trees during the land development process in certain localities. The bill specifies provisions related to the replacement of trees during the development process in localities and allows that any locality may adopt an ordinance providing for the planting and replacement of trees during the development process. Further, the bill specifies provisions related to the conservation of trees during the development process in localities and allows that any locality may adopt an ordinance providing for the conservation of trees during the land development process. The bill directs specified stakeholders and parties to meet at least twice prior to the 2023 Session of the General Assembly to consider specified topics. The bill directs the participants to report their recommendations to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns and the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources by December 1, 2022. The provisions of the bill related to the conservation of trees during the development process do not become effective unless reenacted by the 2023 Session of the General Assembly. Powers of local government; trees during development process; replacement and conservation. Prevents the prohibition or the unreasonable limitation of silvicultural activities related to the replacement of trees during the development process and the conservation of trees during the land development process in certain localities. The bill specifies provisions related to the replacement of trees during the development process in localities and allows that any locality may adopt an ordinance providing for the planting and replacement of trees during the development process. Further, the bill specifies provisions related to the conservation of trees during the development process in localities and allows that any locality may adopt an ordinance providing for the conservation of trees during the land development process. The bill directs specified stakeholders and parties to meet at least twice prior to the 2023 Session of the General Assembly to consider specified topics. The bill directs the participants to report their recommendations to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns and the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources by December 1, 2022. The provisions of the bill related to the conservation of trees during the development process do not become effective unless reenacted by the 2023 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Trees; replacement and conservation during development process, powers of local government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 18-N) (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 18-N) (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0620) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 620 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB537ER) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Title replaced 22107424D-H1 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Passage (77-Y 18-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House with substitute (77-Y 18-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB537H1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22107424D-H1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107424D-H1 |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (18-Y 4-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB537S1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105677D-S1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105677D-S1 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102580D |
Subjects
Counties Cities and Towns
Local Government and Officials
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Trees
Local Government and Officials
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Trees