VA SB537 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB537
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Limitation on mandatory minimum punishment. Provides that mandatory minimum punishments shall not apply to any sentence imposed for an offense committed on or after July 1, 2020.
Title
Mandatory minimum punishment; limitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Senate | Left in Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (12-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102989D |
Same As/Similar To
SB537 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (12-Y 1-N)