VA SB535 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Oversight of research breeders; Animal Welfare Oversight Officer; Animal Welfare Oversight Advisory Committee; civil penalty. Directs the State Veterinarian to hire an Animal Welfare Oversight Officer to inspect and oversee the operations of research breeders, defined in the bill as a person or entity that breeds dogs or cats for sale or transfer for use in testing or research within or outside the Commonwealth, and report any violations of state or federal law by the research breeder. The bill requires each research breeder to register with the Animal Welfare Oversight Officer, pay a registration fee as determined by the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services, and allow the Animal Welfare Oversight Officer continuous access to its facilities located in the Commonwealth. The bill subjects a research breeder that does not register, pay the fee, or allow the Animal Welfare Oversight Officer access to its facilities to a civil penalty of $1,000 for each day of noncompliance. The bill also establishes an Animal Welfare Oversight Advisory Committee.
Title
Research breeders; oversight by Animal Welfare Oversight Officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104308D |